FL S1378 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying the conditions under which a vessel is and is not considered to be operating at slow speed, minimum wake; prohibiting certain parties within certain waterbodies from anchoring or mooring a vessel within a specified distance of a mangrove or to upland vegetation upon public lands; revising civil penalties relating to certain at-risk vessels and prohibited anchoring or mooring; providing procedures for abandoned or lost property relating to certain vessels, etc.
Title
Vessels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1407 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
327 | 332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 4107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |