FL S1488 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the "Florida Public Whistleblower's Act"; revising the actions that an agency or independent contractor is prohibited from taking against an employee who participates in protected activity or discloses certain information; revising applicability of provisions relating to investigative procedures upon receipt of whistleblower information; revising investigative procedures relating to prohibited personnel actions; revising fact-finding responsibilities of the Florida Commission on Human Relations, etc.
Title
Whistleblower's Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H283 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S440 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
S440 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 3187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3188 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3189 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1488 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1488/BillText/Filed/HTML |