FL S1550 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to contract with a vendor to evaluate health information technology activities to identify best practices and methods to increase interoperability; revising the definition of the term "third party" for purposes of liability for payment of certain medical services covered by Medicaid; revising provisions relating to responsibility for Medicaid payments in settlement proceedings, etc.
Title
Health Information Transparency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2514 (Ch. 2017-129) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-05-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 05/01/17, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/03/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1209 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See SB 2514
S2514 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-129, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S2514 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-129, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
408 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |