FL S1626 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revising provisions relating to the Chief Financial Officer's intergovernmental contract tracking system under the Transparency Florida Act; requiring state agencies to post certain information in the tracking system and to update that information; repealing provisions relating to a requirement that state agencies report certain contract information to the Department of Financial Services and transferring that requirement to s. 215.985, F.S., etc.
Title
State Contracting
Sponsors
Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Senate Budget Committee | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee |
Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#50 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Messages | |
2012-03-08 | In Messages | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1045 | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time -SJ 1040, 1045 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/12 | |
2012-03-05 | CS/CS/CS by Budget read 1st time -SJ 808 | |
2012-03-05 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-03-02 | CS/CS/CS by- Budget; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -SJ 805 | |
2012-03-01 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/02/12, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-29 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/01/12, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2012-02-29 | Recalled from Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 744 | |
2012-02-09 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | |
2012-02-09 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 485 | |
2012-02-08 | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time -SJ 354 | |
2012-02-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time -SJ 335 | |
2012-02-07 | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 348 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/07/12, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-06 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 326 | |
2012-02-03 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-02 | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 326 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/02/12, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 222 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 222 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 985 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
216 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 133 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 7305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
427 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
946 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |