FL S1626 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating an exemption from public records for identifying information in compassionate and palliative care plans filed with the Clearinghouse for Compassionate and Palliative Care Plans; authorizing the disclosure of certain information to certain entities and individuals; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Clearinghouse for Compassionate and Palliative Care Plans Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1052 (Related) 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 269 (Ch. 2015-107)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1626 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1626/BillText/Filed/HTML |