FL S2300 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redefines the term "accrediting organization" as used in specified provisions relating to hospitals and other licensed facilities, to include other accrediting organizations that have been approved by the Federal Government for purposes of the Medicare program. Redefines the term "wholesale distribution" as it relates to the sale, purchase, or trade of a prescription drug from certain eligible entities to a contract provider, etc.
Title
Health Care Facilities [SPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Health Regulation | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00197 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Health Regulation; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00197 | |
2010-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1143 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S2434 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00896; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1143 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00896; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00896
H7183 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)
S2434 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00896; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1143 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00896; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2010-156), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00896
H7183 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0395 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0499 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |