FL S7022 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abrogating the scheduled repeal of provisions governing citizen support organizations established under the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission; authorizing a court to order persons convicted of certain violations to pay an additional assessment; authorizing a specified citizen support organization to post certain rewards, etc.
Title
Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission Citizen Support Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/28/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled |
2019-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/27/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 03/06/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/13/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H1121 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-93
S7074 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
S7074 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
379 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 2231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |