GA HB1192 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to require the Department of Community Health to submit a Section 1115 waiver request to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a demonstration project to provide treatment services under Medicaid to persons in this state living with HIV; to provide for implementation upon approval; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Social services; treatment services under Medicaid to persons with HIV; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Butch Parrish [R] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] |
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #547 (Y: 136 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House Hopper |