GA HB1265 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Macon-Bibb County Community Enhancement Authority; to provide a statement of legislative findings; to define certain terms; to provide for a board of trustees, appointment of members, and meetings; to provide for powers and duties; to authorize the issuance of revenue bonds of the authority and to authorize the collection for the payment of such revenue bonds; to make the revenue bonds of the authority exempt from taxation; to fix and provide the venue and jurisdiction of actions relating to any provisions of this Act; to provide for the validation of bonds; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Macon-Bibb County Community Enhancement Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] |
Rep. Nikki Randall [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #685 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #707 - Local Calendar (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #707 - Local Calendar (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 537 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-20 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-19 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House First Readers |