GA HB1304 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to health, so as to create the "Georgia Caregivers Act"; to provide for definitions; to require hospitals to provide patients with the opportunity to identify lay caregivers; to provide that named lay caregivers are not obligated to provide aftercare; to provide that no new private right of action is created; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Caregivers Act; create
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] |
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #809 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #624 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #624 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-06 | Act 828 | |
2022-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House Hopper |