GA HB1402 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act incorporating the City of Mableton, approved May 9, 2022 (Ga. L. 2022, p. 6049), so as to deannex certain properties from the corporate limits of the city; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mableton, City of; deannex certain properties from corporate limits
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Cummings [D] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Rep. Doug Stoner [D] | Rep. Lisa Campbell [D] |
Rep. Solomon Adesanya [D] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #687 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House Hopper |