GA HB354 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 7 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia International and Maritime Trade Center, so as to reconstitute the Georgia International and Maritime Trade Center Authority; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for definitions; to provide for its membership, manner of appointment, terms of office, and powers and duties; to provide for exemption from taxation; to provide for venue; to provide for disposition of property; to exempt its property from levy and sale; to transfer certain assets and liabilities; to authorize the Department of Economic Development to contract with the authority for certain projects; to repeal certain laws; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia International and Maritime Trade Center; reconstitute and authorize Department of Economic Development to contract for certain projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #738 (Y: 154 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #584 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #173 (Y: 157 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #584 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #173 (Y: 157 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Veto V1 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-21 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-01 | House | House Postponed |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Hopper |