GA HB389 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Res
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Res
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-2-35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to taxpayer refunds, so as to change certain provisions regarding interest; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Taxpayer refunds; interest; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #199 - Passage (Y: 83 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #198 - Recon (Y: 91 N: 81 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #197 - Passage (Y: 82 N: 92 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #198 - Recon (Y: 91 N: 81 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #197 - Passage (Y: 82 N: 92 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Res | |
2011-03-16 | House Reconsidered | |
2011-03-16 | House Third Reading Lost | |
2011-03-16 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-01 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-28 | House First Readers |