GA HB867 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to employment and training of peace officers, so as to revise the quorum for transaction of business by the Georgia Peace Officer Standards and Training Council; to clarify that certain investigators employed by the council may retain their weapon and badge upon retirement; to repeal the requirement that peace officers who do not perform satisfactorily on the job related academy entrance examination be ineligible to retake the examination for a period of 30 days; to repeal requirements for the training and certification of police chaplains; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Peace Officer Standards and Training Council; revise quorum for transaction of business; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #775 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Vote #560 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Vote #560 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 386 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House Hopper |