GA HR311 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing February 24th, 2015, as Future Farmers of America Day at the state capitol and inviting the Future Farmers of America (FFA) to be recognized by the House of Representatives; and for other purposes.
Title
Future Farmers of America Day at the capitol; February 24, 2015; recognize and invite to House
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-11 | House | House Read and Referred |
2015-02-11 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43633 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/147643 |