GA SB334 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 563
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 563
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 25-3-23 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to minimum requirements, equipment and clothing, and insurance relative to local fire departments generally, so as to revise qualifications for insurance coverage for firefighters diagnosed with cancer; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Helping Firefighters Beat Cancer Act"; enact
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] |
Sen. Shawn Still [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #676 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #497 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #497 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Act 563 | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |