GA SB354 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Act 556
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Act 556
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to cosmetologists and barbers, so as to exempt from licensure persons performing certain limited responsibilities; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters: to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cosmetologists and Barbers; persons performing certain limited responsibilities; exempt from licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #863 (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #790 (Y: 96 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #440 (Y: 38 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #790 (Y: 96 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #440 (Y: 38 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Act 556 | |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |