GA SB361 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to water resources, so as to create the Georgia Geospatial Advisory Council; to provide for its members and purposes; to provide for reports; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Geospatial Advisory Council; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Vote #767 (Y: 148 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #552 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #552 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-21 | Act 565 | |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |