GA SB390 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to libraries; to amend Chapter 80 of Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to provisions applicable to counties, municipal corporations, and other governmental entities; to amend Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to professions and businesses, so as to repeal Chapter 24, relating to librarians; to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general authority, duties, and procedure of the Department of Administrative Services; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
To amend Titles 20, 36, 43, and 50, related to libraries, education, governmental entities, professions and business; acceptance and use of funds from the American Library Association prohibit under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #600 (Y: 33 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |