GA SB562 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Pine Lake, approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 3935), as amended, so as to restate the city's charter; to change the corporate limits of such city; to transfer powers from the mayor to the city manager and vest additional powers in the city manager; to provide for the mayor to vote in case of a tie; to provide for appointment and removal of department directors; to provide for elections; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Pine Lake; restate the city's charter
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Jackson [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Gail Davenport [D] |
Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Sen. Sally Harrell [D] | Rep. Viola Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #701 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #630 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #630 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Act 629 | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |