HI HB1035 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1035
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the requirement for the Governor to appoint certain representative members of the Aerospace Advisory Committee.
Title
Relating To The Aerospace Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB901 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
HB1035 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 5
HB1035 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1035&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1035_.HTM |