HI HB1042 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for grants-in-aid to the counties for identifying and mapping important agricultural lands, preparing the final submission package to the land use commission, and assistance with exploring county incentives for important agricultural lands. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Important Agricultural Lands; Counties; Grants-in-Aid; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to WLA/PSM, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Espero, Kouchi Co-Chairs; L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Onishi Co-Chairs; Cachola, Woodson, Ward. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 596) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1503) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Ruderman. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from AGL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1097) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to AGL/PSM, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 263). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 762), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-19 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-19-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1289 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA/PSM, WAM.