HI SB1289 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for grants-in-aid to the counties for assistance with identifying and mapping important agricultural lands.
Title
Important Agricultural Lands; Counties; Grants-in-aid. ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to WLA/PSM, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to AGL/PSM, WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1042 (Same As) 2016-04-13 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1289&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB1289_.HTM |