HI HB1096 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify laws relating to operating a moped with a temporary instruction permit. Effective January 7, 2059. (HB1096 HD1)
Title
Moped; Motor Scooter; Motorcycle; Instruction Permits
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to TIA, JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 264). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita, Fontaine. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-24-11 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Luke. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-02-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1323 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.