HI HB1104 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1104
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends exemption from civil service for medical marijuana dispensary program staff in the Department of Health hired after July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2020.
Title
Relating To Civil Service Exemption For The Medical Marijuana Dispensary Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB970 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB1104 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to HLT/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB1104 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to HLT/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1104&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1104_.HTM |