HI HB1104 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1104
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes under the offense of promoting gambling in the first degree the act of hosting activities that advance gambling activity on real property. Permits the forfeiture of real property to the State if the real property was used to promote gambling in the first degree by a person in at least three separate incidents and the person was convicted for at least three of those incidents.
Title
Relating To Gambling.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1104 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1104&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1104_.HTM |