HI HB1107 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Act 026, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Act 026, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes state law consistent with federal law regarding legal limits for gross vehicle weight and axle loads traveling on all public roadways. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Commercial Motor Vehicle Weight Limits.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Act 026, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126). |
2023-04-19 | House | Act 026, on 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126). |
2023-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 705). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1825) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1270) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TCA, JDC. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 402). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 326) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-09 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 02-09-23 10:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1405 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 17