HI SB1405 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1405
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires vehicle weights to be consistent with federal weight limits with respect to legal limits for gross vehicle weight and axle loads traveling on all public roadways. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Commercial Motor Vehicle Weight Limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 437) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-23 9:50AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to TCA, JDC. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1405 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 17
HB1107 (Same As) 2023-04-20 - Act 026, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).
HB1107 (Same As) 2023-04-20 - Act 026, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1126).