HI HB1126 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state procurement office to establish a database of all government procurement contracts, accessible to each governmental entity. Requires state procurement office oversight of procurement information. Appropriates funds to establish the database. (HB1126 HD1)
Title
Procurement; State Procurement Office; Database; Oversight ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 105). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 643), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. |
2015-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1358 (Same As) 2015-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.