HI HB1164 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an agency to transfer the responsibility for preparing and funding Environmental Assessments and Environmental Impact Statements to a user for its use of state or county lands or new improvements to be constructed with state or county funds necessary to accommodate the user's operations.
Title
Harbors; Environmental Assessments and Environmental Impact Statements
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-12-09 9:00am in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB982 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1164&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1164_.htm |