HI HB1171 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Blanks out the sunset date of Act 2, Second Special Session Laws of Hawaii 2007; clarifies Act 2 to prohibit operation of large capacity ferry vessel if no environmental impact statement is accepted prior to sunset of Act 2; terminates authority to operate large capacity ferry vessel unless agreement between DOT and operator reached on financing debt service and principal of general obligation bonds by 45 days after adjournment sine die of regular session. (HB1171 HD1)
Title
Transportation; Environmental Impact Statement
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Recommitted to FIN with Representative(s) Finnegan voting no and Representative(s) Takai excused. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Deferred one day 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 766) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-04-09 4:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-04-09. | |
2009-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-09 6:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-25 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 22 | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB989 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.