HI HB1187 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the cigarette tax and tobacco tax law by establishing maximum dollar amounts that shall be distributed among certain non-general funds. Retains provision that the general fund receive the remainder after distribution. (HB1187 HD1)
Title
Cigarette Tax and Tobacco Tax Law; Distribution Maximums
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 291). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Rhoads, Thielen, Tupola voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 630) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1297 (Same As) 2015-07-15 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 238, 07/14/2015, (Gov. Msg. No. 1347).