HI HB1211 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1211
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the conveyance tax rate for certain properties. Exempts conveyances of certain real property from the conveyance tax. Establishes the homeless services fund. Eliminates the cap on the amount of conveyance tax collections allocated to the land conservation fund and rental housing revolving fund. Allocates ten percent of conveyance tax collections to the homeless services fund. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Conveyance Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 716) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-14 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Ganaden, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Chun, Hashem. |
2023-02-10 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 8:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1211 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
Subjects
Allocations
Conveyance Tax Rates and Exemptions
Homeless Services Fund
Land Conservation Fund
Rental Housing Revolving Fund
Conveyance Tax Rates and Exemptions
Homeless Services Fund
Land Conservation Fund
Rental Housing Revolving Fund