HI HB1238 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1238
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the family court to terminate parental rights if the court determines, by clear and convincing evidence, that a natural parent committed sexual assault of the other natural parent; the child was conceived as a result of the sexual assault by the parent; and termination of parental rights is in the best interests of the child, under certain conditions. Requires the family court to suspend custody and visitation, after proper filing of a petition and a hearing, to any child whose parent or legal guardian is charged for a sexual assault or other offense, under certain conditions.
Title
Relating To Parental Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB210 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1238 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
HB1238 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1238&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB1238_.HTM |