HI HB1305 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to issue certificates of birth, marriage, divorce, or death that contain Hawaiian names as accurately and within the same time frame as certificates that contain names that are not in the Hawaiian language. Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
Department of Health; Certificates; English and Hawaiian Languages
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1305&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1305_.HTM |