HI HB1305 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 214, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 214, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the State and electrical and gas utilities to enter into a mutual assistance agreement with an out-of-state utility to assist in the restoration of electrical or natural gas power following a natural disaster or emergency. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Mutual Assistance Agreement.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 214, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 214, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316). |
2019-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 859). |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). |
2019-04-24 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 855). |
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-23 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 846) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1866) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1380) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPH. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 461). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1195) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 268) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-05-19 8:45AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |