HI HB14 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Okamura excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Okamura excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires district court to delete from a driver's traffic abstract any violation that the driver is found not to have committed. Prohibits disclosure of dispositions of infractions that precede the date of request by more than years. Specifies that only convictions or civil judgments for moving violations and administrative driver's license revocations be released on a certified traffic abstract. Effective October 1, 2012. (HB14 HD1)
Title
Traffic Abstract; Expungement; Limitation on Disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Okamura excused (1). | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 13-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Okamura, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 01-25-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |