HI HB14 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Applies the requirement for all public secondary schools to implement a school year that includes 990 student hours to all school years beginning with the 2015-2016 school year. Requires that by the 2016-2018 school years, the 180-day school year requirement include 1,080 student hours for both elementary and secondary school grades. Clarifies that the definition of "student hours" is to be determined by the Board of Education in consultation with the exclusive representatives of the appropriate bargaining units. (HB14 HD1)
Title
Department of Education; Student Hours
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan, LoPresti, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 566) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ing, Say, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong, LoPresti, Matsumoto, Tupola; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ichiyama, Ito. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-15. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-04-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB822 (Same As)