HI HB1403 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates the Department of Agriculture to establish a little fire ant Pesticide Treatment Coupon Pilot Project and site map.
Title
Little Fire Ant; Hawaii Island; Pesticide Treatment Coupon Pilot Project; Little Fire Ant Site Map; Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee on ENE deferred the measure. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee on AGL deferred the measure. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to ENE/AGL, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 130). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 652), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 274), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-13 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-19-15 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-19-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Cachola, Choy, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Ito. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Tuesday, 02-10-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1403&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1403_.HTM |