HI HB1420 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 105, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 105, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for burial grants for qualifying Filipino-American veterans to provide funeral and burial services and transportation of their remains to the Philippines. (HB1420 CD1)
Title
Relating To Filipino Veterans Burial Assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Act 105, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 105, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 115). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 115) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Cachola, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 2:10PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-17 1:30PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Wakai. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ito, Cachola Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2017-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 510) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1335) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 963) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 194). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 918), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 423) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-09-17 9:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |