HI HB1479 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the State Fire Council additional flexibility in employing personnel to administer the reduced ignition propensity cigarette program.
Title
Relating To The Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2012 (Same As) 2022-01-20 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Fire Protection
Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program
Special Fund
Staff
State Fire Council Package
Reduced Ignition Propensity Cigarette Program
Special Fund
Staff
State Fire Council Package
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1479&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1479_.HTM |