HI HB1511 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the ERS from investing directly in fossil fuel companies. Requires divestiture.
Title
ERS; Investments; Fossil Fuels
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-10-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EEP, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and passed first reading. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1511&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1511_.HTM |