HI HB1540 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Stipulates that the auditor will contract with a suitable entity to conduct of study of closed claims in the workers' compensation system, that includes the study of processing time for closed claims. Extends the deadline for the study to 11/30/2018 and the deadline for the legislative report to twenty days prior to the regular session of 2019. Makes an appropriation for the study.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1540 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB1236 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
SB1236 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1540&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1540_.HTM |