HI HB1540 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Stipulates that the auditor will contract with a suitable entity to conduct of study of closed claims in the workers' compensation system, that includes the study of processing time for closed claims. Extends the deadline for the study to 11/30/2018 and the deadline for the legislative report to twenty days prior to the regular session of 2019. Makes an appropriation for the study.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1236 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1540 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1540 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1540&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1540_.HTM |