HI HB1551 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that fire safety use is a beneficial use of fresh water in the State Water Code. Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources, in consultation with the Hawaii Emergency Management Agency, to cooperate with the counties and reservoir owners to develop protocols and agreements for the use of reservoir waters for fire safety purposes. Amends the conditions, manner, and areas in which the Commission on Water Resource Management can declare and provide notice of water shortages and emergencies.
Title
Relating To Water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-12 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2089 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1551&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1551_.HTM |