HI HB1586 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a nexus standard for taxing out-of-state businesses on their business activities in Hawaii.
Title
Taxation; Out-of-State Business; Nexus Standard
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-09 10:00am in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused (3). | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 419), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Berg, Evans, Manahan, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wakai. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 02-12-09 7:30am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to EBM, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |