HI HB1620 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from insurance code, associations (1) organized before 1880; (2) whose members are active, retired, or honorably discharged members of the U.S. armed forces or sea services; and (3) whose principal purpose is to provide insurance and other benefits to their members.
Title
Insurance; Fraternal Benefit Societies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 34). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 690), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, McKelvey, Morita, Souki, Thielen. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 555), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Souki. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 02-17-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to PBM, CPC, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |