HI HB1620 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit for individual taxpayers within the State who install plastic water catchments on the properties at which they reside. Allows taxpayer to elect to make the tax credit refundable. (HB1620 HD1)
Title
Plastic Water Catchment System Tax Credit; Income Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 654-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-11-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-19 | House | Prefiled. |