HI HB163 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds to the criteria for mandatory minimum imprisonment terms and extended terms of imprisonment offenses against pregnant women. Establishes that physical abuse against a family or household member who is pregnant is a class C felony.
Title
Offenses Against Pregnant Women; Sentencing; Extended Terms of Imprisonment; Abuse of Family or Household Member
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB210 (Same As) 2015-02-17 - The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=163&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB163_.HTM |