HI SB210 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds to the criteria for mandatory minimum imprisonment terms and extended terms of imprisonment offenses against pregnant women. Establishes that physical abuse against a family or household member who is pregnant is a class C felony.
Title
Offenses Against Pregnant Women; Sentencing; Extended Terms of Imprisonment; Abuse of Family or Household Member
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee on JDL will reconsider its previous decision on 2/5/15 and will hold a public decision making on 02-17-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB163 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=210&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB210_.HTM |